Financial history STOCKCROSS PARENT TEACHER AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1105137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £17.58k £22.23k £15.78k £29.03k £11.89k
Total expenditure £20.00k £20.03k £14.95k £18.13k £24.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £500 N/A