Financial history RICHARD DUMBRECK'S SINGLETON TRUST

Charity number: 1106862
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £218.18k £208.26k £241.13k £277.48k £263.44k
Total expenditure £161.84k £205.14k £204.93k £265.63k £197.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A