Trustees RICHARD DUMBRECK'S SINGLETON TRUST
Charity number: 1106862

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEITH WALKER | Chair | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Dawn Hindley | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alec Robert Davies | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Smith | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Sarah Cholmondeley | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KAY | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK ALLEN | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANNE ROGERSON | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
SARA ELIZABETH FRYARS | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.