Financial history BAIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1103185
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £67.73k £73.63k £62.83k £78.15k £90.54k
Total expenditure £75.16k £125.45k £59.70k £116.49k £207.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A