Financial history THE DISABLED RAMBLERS

Charity number: 1103508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.49k £14.09k £14.41k £21.74k £20.11k
Total expenditure £9.30k £13.77k £14.92k £26.79k £20.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.90k N/A