Trustees NORTH KENT MIND
Charity number: 1103790

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lyndsey Stukalov-Stone | Chair | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Hamill | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fatai Oladele Matilukuro-Olanuga | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Gow | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
DONALD IAIN MACLEOD | Trustee | 11 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Oleg Stukalov-Stone | Trustee | 20 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW UPSTILL | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.