NAID

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NAID Activities are: Education. Information Technology. Training. Development. Advocacy and Welfare Right Services. Responding to people in Need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 02 June 2004: Standard registration
- NATIONWIDE ASSOCIATION FOR INTEGRATED DEVELOPMENT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ahmed Ali | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Masudah Ali | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Ali | Trustee | 30 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173 | £403 | £7.26k | £10.33k | £13.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13 | £76 | £6.79k | £9.85k | £14.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 24 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 24 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 October 2020 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 08 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED ON 27 OCTOBER 2003 AND 01 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN BANGLADESH (THE "AREAS OF BENEFIT") AS THE DIRECTORS DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOREGOING BY: 1. ADVANCING EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONG WOMEN; 2. PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY: (A) THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND THE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES IN THE AREAS OF BENEFIT; AND (C) THE PROMOTION OF SUSTAINABLE MEANS OF ACHIEVING ECONOMIC GROWTH AND REGENERATION. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT TO MEAN "DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET ITS OWN NEEDS"; AND BY 3. DEVELOPING THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THOSE IN THE AREAS OF BENEFIT IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND BANGLADESH
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Floor
314 Caerphilly Road
Cardiff
CF14 4NT
- Phone:
- 07720839047
- Email:
- info@naid.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window