Financial history LEDBURY AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity number: 1104465
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £9.31k £6.43k £12.23k £16.25k £17.52k
Total expenditure £9.14k £6.22k £12.26k £14.13k £15.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £150 N/A N/A