Trustees LEDBURY AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1104465

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Jane Churchill | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jane Morland | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelvin Lynch | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alasdair Gibson | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Mason | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Peter Townsend | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
FREDERICK JAN LUMB | Trustee | 27 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
SALLY HOLLIDAY | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JENNIFER HODGESS HARRISON | Trustee | 17 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW CASTRO | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.