Financial history YAD VEACHISOMOCH L'CHAIM

Charity number: 1105231
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £412.87k £660.26k £687.86k £821.62k £1.28m
Total expenditure £449.31k £503.81k £581.76k £781.98k £886.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.59k £26.70k £10.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £641.23k £687.82k £819.98k £1.27m
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £15 £43 £1.65k £10.96k
Income - Other N/A £19.01k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £503.81k £581.76k £781.98k £886.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.50k £2.64k £2.88k £6.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £19.48k £42.49k £63.44k £9.80k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0