Financial history THE DURAND CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1105311
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.90k £1.28k £3.36k £1.30k £4.71k
Total expenditure £60 £2.01k £96 £6.08k £65
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A