Financial history FIX IT (UK) LIMITED

Charity number: 1105320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £491.23k £590.79k £596.88k £723.36k £961.81k
Total expenditure £451.72k £604.58k £695.92k £588.19k £747.50k
Income from government contracts £232.47k £307.58k £337.47k £420.36k £650.00k
Income from government grants £10.00k £15.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £16.15k £0 £0 £1.90k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £804 £4.77k £116 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £573.84k £592.08k £721.85k £955.95k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £8 £25 £1.39k £3.96k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £603.45k £695.92k £588.19k £747.50k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £5.62k £4.36k £10.59k £10.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £1.13k £0 £0 £0