DR KERSHAW'S HOSPICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides palliative care services for local people with life limiting illness
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,840,084
Donations and legacies | £1.82m | |
Charitable activities | £2.58m | |
Other trading activities | £1.32m | |
Investments | £83.72k | |
Other | £42.30k |
Total expenditure:
£4,870,117
Raising funds | £838.29k | |
Charitable activities | £4.03m | |
Other | £0 |
£336,293 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £838.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.03m | |
Retained for future use | £969.97k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £838.29k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.03m | |
Retained for future use | £1.31m |
People

112 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
389 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oldham
Governance
- 19 December 1984: Standard registration
- THE OLDHAM HOSPICE APPEAL (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA NICHOLLS | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW FLEMING | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIE HESSELGROVE WARD | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN TAYLOR | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
DARYL IAN MARTIN KITCHENER | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eileen Jones | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Buchanan | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Hadfield | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Macdonald | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Schofield | Trustee | 27 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Louise Damianou | Trustee | 09 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Dr PAUL RUSSELL COOK | Trustee | 11 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Richard Lipton | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.62m | £4.37m | £4.32m | £4.57m | £5.84m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.83m | £3.38m | £3.69m | £4.38m | £4.87m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £70.00k | £1.16m | £415.50k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.20m | £2.39m | £2.02m | £1.13m | £1.82m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £974.91k | £413.73k | £666.01k | £1.35m | £1.32m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.41m | £1.45m | £1.60m | £2.03m | £2.58m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £43.03k | £33.09k | £19.02k | £29.92k | £83.72k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £89.98k | £18.31k | £38.48k | £42.30k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £293.31k | £508.69k | £1.01m | £523.49k | £1.20m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.72m | £2.88m | £3.17m | £3.74m | £4.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £443.71k | £388.47k | £522.46k | £637.05k | £838.29k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.91k | £26.39k | £28.24k | £22.36k | £13.65k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £1.66m | £110.49k | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.17m | £3.86m | £4.23m | £4.13m | £4.07m | |
|
Long-term investments | £31.88k | £31.88k | £32.22k | £3.11m | £3.95m | |
|
Other assets | £8.37m | £7.68m | £6.40m | £3.67m | £4.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.87m | £1.88m | £279.01k | £364.35k | £204.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 SEPTEMBER 2004 as amended on 18 Jan 2024 as amended on 18 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ILLNESS AND SUFFERING IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT:- 3(1) BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING AND CONDUCTING RESIDENTIAL NURSING AND CONVALESCENT HOMES FOR THE RECEPTION AND CARE OF PERSONS OF EITHER SEX WHO ARE SUFFERING AT ANY AGE FROM ANY CHRONIC OR TERMINAL ILLNESS OR FROM ANY DISABILITY OR DISEASE ATTRIBUTABLE TO OLD AGE OR FROM ANY OTHER PHYSICAL OR MENTAL INFIRMITY, DISABILITY OR DISEASE AND SO THAT ANY SUCH HOME MAY BE RESTRICTED AS AFORESAID TO PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM ANY PARTICULAR TYPE OR TYPES OF ILLNESS, DISABILITY OR INFIRMITY AND BY PROVIDING MEDICAL OR OTHER TREATMENT OR ATTENTION FOR ANY SUCH PERSONS AS AFORESAID IN THEIR OWN HOME; 3(2) BY CONDUCTING AND PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING RESEARCH IN TO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM ANY SUCH ILLNESS, DISABILITY, DISEASE OR INFIRMITY AND PARTICULARLY IN TO THE CARE AND TREATMENT OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM CANCER OR TERMINAL ILLNESSES AND BY PROVIDING FOR THE DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; 3(3) BY PROMOTING OR ENCOURAGING OR ASSISTING IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF DOCTORS, NURSES, PHYSIOTHERAPISTS AND OTHER PERSONS ENGAGED IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE SURGERY, NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES AND IN THE TEACHING OR TRAINING OF STUDENTS IN ANY BRANCH OF MEDICINE, SURGERY OR NURSING OR ALLIED SERVICES
Area of benefit
OLDHAM AND DISTRICT
Linked charities
- 19 December 1984 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dr Kershaws Hospice
Turf Lane
Royton
OLDHAM
OL2 6EU
- Phone:
- 0161-624-2727
- Email:
- info@drkh.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window