Register of Charities - The Charity Commission SURBITON HOSPITAL FUND
Charity number: 1056510-6
Linked charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 21 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED BY A SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 21 OCTOBER 2004
AS AMENDED ON 10 MAY 2021
AS AMENDED ON 23 DEC 2021
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES RELATING TO THE GENERAL OR ANY SPECIFIC PURPOSES OF THE KINGSTON HOSPITAL NHS FOUNDATION TRUST OR THE PURPOSES OF THE HEALTH SERVICES (AS DESCRIBED IN S1 NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICES ACT 2006 OR ANY STATUTORY MODIFICATION THEREOF).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 09 December 2004: Standard registration
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.