THE KYNGE'S COLLEGE OF OUR LADYE OF ETON BESYDE WINDESORE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Eton College was founded by Henry VI in 1440. Today it is an independent boys' boarding school whose charitable purpose is the advancement of education by the provision, support and conduct of a school and ancillary or incidental educational activities for the benefit of students and/or the wider community; and the preservation and maintenance of the College's historic buildings and Collections.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£91,268,000
Donations and legacies | £14.24m | |
Charitable activities | £52.39m | |
Other trading activities | £1.61m | |
Investments | £16.39m | |
Other | £6.65m |
Total expenditure:
£101,087,000
Raising funds | £11.57m | |
Charitable activities | £89.52m | |
Other | £0 |
-£23,892,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £11.57m | |
Charitable expenditure | £89.52m |
People

1156 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 33 |
£70k to £80k | 24 |
£80k to £90k | 19 |
£90k to £100k | 27 |
£100k to £110k | 23 |
£110k to £120k | 33 |
£120k to £130k | 18 |
£130k to £140k | 16 |
£140k to £150k | 14 |
£150k to £200k | 11 |
£250k to £300k | 1 |
£350k to £400k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 23 December 2014: Standard registration
- ETON COLLEGE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sir Nicholas David Coleridge | Chair | 07 October 2023 |
|
|||||||
Anne Magill | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Harold Nsamba Matovu KC | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Professor Michael Proctor | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Clement Sais Brown PhD | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
John Frederick William Birney PhD | Trustee | 08 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Simon Peter Vivian | Trustee | 09 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Peter John McKee | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|||||||
Baroness Helena Morrissey | Trustee | 03 February 2018 |
|
|||||||
SIR MARK LYALL GRANT | Trustee | 14 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
MARK ESIRI | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.25m | £77.98m | £84.95m | £100.37m | £91.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.78m | £83.42m | £86.39m | £102.58m | £101.09m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.63m | £17.14m | £5.64m | £7.95m | £14.24m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £2.31m | £1.12m | £1.09m | £1.53m | £1.61m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £46.24m | £42.56m | £46.07m | £50.65m | £52.39m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £734.00k | £1.37m | £2.57m | £2.19m | £10.83m | |
|
Income - Investment | £16.88m | £12.69m | £28.07m | £33.31m | £16.39m | |
|
Income - Other | £7.19m | £4.47m | £4.07m | £6.93m | £6.65m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £331.78k | £3.08m | £653.00k | £883.00k | £534.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £69.73m | £72.03m | £74.27m | £88.98m | £89.52m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £10.05m | £11.39m | £12.13m | £13.60m | £11.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.00k | £36.00k | £64.00k | £65.00k | £68.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £4.48m | £5.09m | £3.34m | £3.70m | £5.19m | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £88.86m | £102.72m | £124.45m | £127.94m | £144.26m | |
|
Long-term investments | £473.82m | £475.53m | £559.12m | £567.98m | £552.90m | |
|
Other assets | £49.68m | £64.07m | £49.76m | £61.59m | £37.38m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£39.96m | -£39.55m | -£36.86m | -£11.82m | -£2.84m | |
|
Total liabilities | £128.23m | £149.57m | £154.07m | £183.56m | £192.86m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 01 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
STATUTES APPROVED BY HER MAJESTY THE QUEEN IN COUNCIL 24 OCTOBER 1973, AS AMENDED 9 JANUARY 1976, 21 APRIL 1980, 21 JULY 1999, 5 SEPTEMBER 2006 AND 12 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED ON 12 OCT 2016
Charitable objects
A. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION, SUPPORT AND CONDUCT OF A SCHOOL KNOWN AS ETON COLLEGE AND BY ANCILLARY OR INCIDENTAL EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND OTHER ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING THE CONDUCT OF SERVICES IN ITS CHAPEL OR CHAPELS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF STUDENTS (BEING PERSONS ENROLLED ON A COURSE OF STUDY PROVIDED BY ETON COLLEGE AND / OR THE WIDER COMMUNITY; AND IN SO FAR AS IT IS NOT INCOMPATIBLE WITH THE OBJECT SET OUT IN A ABOVE: B. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND REPAIR OF: (A) THE BUILDINGS AND FABRIC OF ETON COLLEGE (INCLUDING THE CHAPELS OF THE COLLEGE) WHICH ARE OF ARCHITECTURAL OR HISTORIC IMPORTANCE; AND (B) THE FURNITURE, PICTURES AND CHATTELS OF ANY DESCRIPTION HAVING HISTORIC OR ARTISTIC INTEREST CONNECTED WITH THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD
Linked charities
- 23 December 2014 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BURSARY
ETON COLLEGE
WINDSOR
SL4 6DJ
- Phone:
- 01753370542
- Email:
- clerk@etoncollege.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window