Financial history everyFAMILY Limited

Charity number: 1108713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.41m £1.22m £1.16m £863.65k £864.59k
Total expenditure £1.42m £1.25m £1.14m £967.65k £957.07k
Income from government contracts £197.74k £128.63k £170.34k £124.08k £26.89k
Income from government grants £1.21m £135.62k £3.87k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £9.00k £15.47k £29.81k £50.13k £46.38k
Income - Other trading activities £54.14k £61.93k £8.53k £7.68k £20.04k
Income - Charitable activities £1.34m £1.14m £1.12m £805.83k £798.17k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £475 £764 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.42m £1.25m £1.13m £966.58k £950.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds £892 £130 £10.62k £1.07k £6.46k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £7.80k £8.40k £7.12k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0