Financial history NORTH WORCESTERSHIRE BASEMENT PROJECTS LTD

Charity number: 1106209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £422.32k £374.15k £330.26k £296.17k £402.89k
Total expenditure £331.20k £344.50k £362.06k £382.28k £384.89k
Income from government contracts N/A £99.64k £99.64k £99.64k £87.09k
Income from government grants £125.00k £50.35k £60.86k £46.00k £28.38k