NORTH WORCESTERSHIRE BASEMENT PROJECTS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Basement Project is a Worcestershire charity which supports young people aged 25 and under; in securing and sustaining accommodation; who are in crisis, homeless, or at risk of homelessness & in resolving the many contributing factors such as finances, relationships & mediation, physical and mental health, access to employment, education and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £87,088 from 1 government contract(s) and £28,384 from 3 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 October 2004: Standard registration
- BROMSGROVE YOUTH HOMELESSNESS FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Louise Preece | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen Gwillam | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shalaka Vinayak Bapat | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hindle-Smith | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Pennell | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Squires | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Trueman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan William Deakin | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Morris | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hood | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MORGAN | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £422.32k | £374.15k | £330.26k | £296.17k | £402.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.20k | £344.50k | £362.06k | £382.28k | £384.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £99.64k | £99.64k | £99.64k | £87.09k | |
|
Income from government grants | £125.00k | £50.35k | £60.86k | £46.00k | £28.38k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 02 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/08/2013 as amended on 11 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN WORCESTERSHIRE BY: A) ASSISTING YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE POTENTIALLY HOMELESS, ACTUALLY HOMELESS AND/OR UNEMPLOYED AND/OR LOCAL AUTHORITY CARE LEAVERS IN COMPETING EFFECTIVELY IN THE LABOUR MARKET; B) PROVIDING CLEAR AND ADEQUATE INFORMATION/RESOURCES TO YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE POTENTIALLY HOMELESS, ACTUALLY HOMELESS AND/OR UNEMPLOYED AND/OR LOCAL AUTHORITY CARE LEAVERS SO THEY ARE FULLY INFORMED OF THEIR RIGHTS AND RESPONSIBILITIES, ETC; AND C) ENCOURAGING, SUPPORTING AND EMPOWERING YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE POTENTIALLY HOMELESS, ACTUALLY HOMELESS AND/OR UNEMPLOYED AND/OR LOCAL AUTHORITY CARE LEAVERS TO REPRESENT THEMSELVES
Area of benefit
BROMSGROVE, WORCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Hanover Street
Bromsgrove
Bromsgrove
Worcs
B61 7JH
- Phone:
- 01527 832993
- Email:
- info@basementproject.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window