Trustees NORTH WORCESTERSHIRE BASEMENT PROJECTS LTD
Charity number: 1106209

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Louise Preece | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Stephen Gwillam | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shalaka Vinayak Bapat | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Hindle-Smith | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Pennell | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Squires | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pippa Trueman | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan William Deakin | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Henry Morris | Trustee | 13 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Hood | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MORGAN | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SPENCER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.