Financial history CONTINENTAL STAR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1107046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 21/06/2020 21/06/2021 21/06/2022 21/06/2023 21/06/2024
Total gross income £43.65k £9.34k £72.92k £16.50k £10.49k
Total expenditure £23.90k £20.02k £35.98k £13.91k £10.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.42k