Trustees THE EXMOOR NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity Number: 1108445

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Stevenson | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Windle | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Windle | Trustee | 30 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Jennings | Trustee | 27 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Celia Tickner | Trustee | 25 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sian Parry | Trustee | 16 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUTH HYETT | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|||||
BRIAN COULSON | Trustee | 02 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ST JOHN HANKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLINE JANET GIDDENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES PYM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.