Financial history MUSTAQBILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106573
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.35k £17.76k £27.42k £10.00k £4.00k
Total expenditure £2.02k £11.78k £24.48k £15.32k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.50k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.25k £27.42k N/A N/A