THE DARTMOOR SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the public in the culture, local history, arts,flora,fauna, geographic and historic features of Dartmoor and neighbouring areas by the provision of lectures, published research and organised excursions and by providing advice, information and support on the preservation of the unique features of the area and its landscape.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 26 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Reverend Canon Nicholas Paul Fennemore | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Kenneth John | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Elizabeth Cole | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Lucy Elizabeth Van der Steen | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthea Clair Jonquil Hoey | Trustee | 07 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caya Edwards | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Layland Branfield | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bill Murray | Trustee | 14 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS ORCHARD | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.14k | £5.93k | £6.69k | £6.99k | £7.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.63k | £3.39k | £2.95k | £10.14k | £8.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 1999 AS AMENDED 23 JULY 2005 AND 4 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTURE, LOCAL HISTORY, ARTS, FLORA, FAUNA, GEOGRAPHIC AND HISTORIC FEATURES OF DARTMOOR AND NEIGHBOURING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF LECTURES, PUBLISHED RESEARCH AND ORGANISED EXCURSIONS AND BY PROVIDING ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT ON THE PRESERVATION OF THE UNIQUE FEATURES OF THE AREA AND ITS LANDSCAPE, AND BY OCCASIONAL GRANTS TO INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS OR OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES IN SUPPORT OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
DARTMOOR
Contact information
- Address:
-
Windyridge
Midella Road
Yelverton
PL20 6AU
- Phone:
- 01822853826
- Email:
- info@dartmoorsociety.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window