Financial history CARISMA (COMMUNITY ALLIANCE FOR RENEWAL, INNER SOUTH MANCHESTER AREA)

Charity Number: 1112586
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £77.22k £46.74k £29.20k £2.80k £9.48k
Total expenditure £80.67k £43.11k £28.39k £15.23k £12.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A