Trustees THE NORTHUMBRIA REGION U3A
Charity number: 1116695

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Wendy Dale | Chair | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Moira Stokoe | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|||||
Keith Allison | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Mary Mulkerrin | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Edward Hugh Watt | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Wilkinson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cecilia Mary Coulson | Trustee | 25 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter George Barnett | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Barlow Secretary | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Carr | Trustee | 24 April 2019 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.