Trustees THE ASSOCIATION OF GOVERNING BODIES OF INDEPENDENT SCHOOLS
Charity number: 1108756

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Jane Marten | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Monica Bhandari | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Margaret Gardiner | Trustee | 19 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lord Francis Maude | Trustee | 05 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie-Anne Rees | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barnaby James Northover | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John David Edward | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev David John Stanton | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
DIANA ELIZABETH DEBORAH ROBINSON | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Caroline Louise Jordan | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Christine Margaret Keunen | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Irfan Hamid Latif | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|||||
TOM BEARDMORE-GRAY | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|||||
ELEANOR ROSE ALLEN | Trustee | 18 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Gerrard Taylor | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Mark Dillon-Robinson | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael William Gregson | Trustee | 06 March 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.