AGE CONCERN REGIONAL SUPPORT SERVICES (WEST MIDLANDS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Infrastructure support to Age Concern West Midlands Region
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 01 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER OAKLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Amanda Allen | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Ernest Jason Guest | Trustee | 03 November 2021 |
|
|||||
CLARE THOMAS | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANNE FRANCES HASTINGS | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Heather Osborne | Trustee | 08 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.52k | £18.20k | £16.51k | £19.23k | £13.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.58k | £18.47k | £17.51k | £13.58k | £14.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 JUNE 2009 AND 28 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE IN AND AROUND THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Age UK Hfds & Worcs
Malvern Gate
Bromwich Road
WORCESTER
WR2 4BN
- Phone:
- 01905 740950
- Email:
- rsswm@ageukhw.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window