Financial history U.W.C. GREAT BRITAIN LIMITED

Charity number: 1107423
Charity reporting is up to date (51 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.20k £30.41k £21.05k £41.88k £79.00k
Total expenditure £45.10k £30.78k £17.43k £65.41k £65.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A