Financial history BUDLEIGH MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1107812
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £10.65k £73.12k £82.74k £127.94k £118.39k
Total expenditure £12.03k £72.86k £89.73k £107.86k £122.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k £1.00k £16.50k £500