Financial history THE GLOBE LODGE NO 23 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 1107340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £7.32k £7.46k £8.22k £8.31k £10.16k
Total expenditure £8.20k £8.15k £8.05k £29.60k £11.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A