Financial history CHARLBURY AND OVERSEAS COMMUNITY PROJECTS LTD

Charity number: 1110285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £21.22k £442 £7.08k £17.17k £19.86k
Total expenditure £23.18k £1.79k £7.57k £17.41k £21.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A