CASTLE RISING PLAYING FIELD TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist Castle Rising Cricket Club, Castle Rising Football Club and other social and charitable and sporting activities within Castle Rising and the surrounding area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Norfolk
Governance
- 16 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE RIGHT HONOURABLE THE LORD HOWARD OF RISING | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
RICHARD JAMES ROBERT SHIPP | Trustee |
|
||||||||||
RICHARD JOHN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £225 | £75 | £845 | £600 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £617 | £1.81k | £51 | £3 | £500 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 12 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 20 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 17 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
1. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANCIES OF CASTLE RISING NORFOLK TO PROMOTE THE PROVISION AND UPKEEP OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF CRICKET, FOOTBALL AND OTHER FORMS OF SPORT OR RECREATION. 2. SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CASTLE RISING AND SURROUNDING AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FORM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
CASTLE RISING, NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
CASTLE RISING
KING'S LYNN
NORFOLK
PE31 6AF
- Phone:
- 01553631556
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window