Financial history Brighton & Hove Albion Foundation

Charity number: 1110978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.44m £3.14m £3.73m £3.90m £3.58m
Total expenditure £3.41m £3.11m £3.69m £3.87m £3.58m
Income from government contracts N/A £338.43k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £239.57k £304.51k £837.21k £590.72k £190.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £801.05k £491.74k £964.62k £906.30k £825.49k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £83.17k
Income - Charitable activities £2.63m £2.65m £2.76m £2.97m £2.63m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.01k £3.67k £2.66k £23.60k £41.06k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.23m £2.91m £3.52m £3.63m £3.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £181.91k £209.73k £172.51k £243.34k £194.43k
Expenditure - Governance £24.61k £21.79k £21.86k £24.83k £26.60k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0