SWANSEA CARERS' CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swansea Carers Centre is a local charity supporting carers within the City & County of Swansea. We support all carers of those with an illness or disability, including learning disability, mental health problems, physical disability, dementia and other long term limiting illnesses. This also includes parents of children with a disability or chronic illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £975,815 from 18 government grant(s)
People

38 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 05 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeffrey Pulman | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Price | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Davidson | Trustee | 19 November 2020 |
|
|||||
BYRON FUSSELL | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sue Davies | Trustee | 21 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
SONIA THOMAS | Trustee | 03 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
GILL STEVENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT BRYN WILLIAMS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALBERT BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £674.46k | £1.04m | £1.10m | £1.05m | £1.34m | |
|
Total expenditure | £667.53k | £844.67k | £939.13k | £1.05m | £1.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £308.35k | £381.91k | £527.51k | £587.79k | £975.82k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £673.18k | £1.04m | £1.10m | £1.05m | £132.68k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.28k | £680 | £145 | £515 | £2.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £667.53k | £844.67k | £939.13k | £1.05m | £1.29m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £143 | £0 | £0 | £2.25k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £449.88k | £744.41k | £842.79k | £824.01k | £878.98k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £17.82k | £115.35k | £56.70k | £36.93k | £40.37k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30 MAR 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17 APR 2019
Charitable objects
A. TO HELP ALLEVIATE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND OR INCLUDING MENTAL AND PHYSICAL STRESS ATTRIBUTABLE TO CARING AMONGST CARERS BY THE GIVING OF PRACTICAL HELP, ADVICE, ASSISTANCE, ADVOCACY SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO THOSE PEOPLE CARING, OR WHO HAVE CARED, FOR OTHERS WHO ARE DEPENDENT ON THEM THROUGH DISABILITY ARISING FROM AGE, PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR MENTAL DISABILITY AND WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES WITHIN WALES; B. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONG CARERS, THE PUBLIC AND PROFESSIONAL AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES;
Area of benefit
WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ty Findlay
Prince Of Wales Road
SWANSEA
West Glamorgan
SA1 2EX
- Phone:
- 01792653344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window