LIVE AUDACIOUS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Audacious Events include the Audacious Summer conference. This events promte the well being of the young people and encourage them to make good lifestyle choices and reach their full potential. Audacious Academy is one or two year full time leadership training course which encourages young people to become full mature leaders who make a positive impact within society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 01 April 2005: Standard registration
- AUDACIOUS (Working name)
- AUDACIOUS ACADEMY (Working name)
- AUDACIOUS NIGHTS (Working name)
- AUDACIOUS WORSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK FOSTER | Trustee | 26 January 2012 |
|
|
||||||
GLYN BARRETT | Trustee |
|
||||||||
STUART KEIR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.69k | £5.87k | £3.32k | £3.41k | £3.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.15k | £1.14k | £1.17k | £1.23k | £1.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE YOUNG PEOPLE AND ADULTS UNDER THE AGE OF 35 THROUGH THEIR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AND OTHERWISE BY PROMOTING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL AND SOCIAL POTENTIAL IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY GO TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Audacious
Trinity Way
MANCHESTER
M3 7BB
- Phone:
- 01618307000
- Email:
- info@liveaudacious.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window