ROTARY CLUBS OF TELFORD AND DISTRICT TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust acts as a charitable arm of the four rotary clubs in Telford. It promotes a "Tree of Light" annually together with any other activities agreed amongst the clubs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 14 April 2005: Standard registration
- THE ROTARY CLUBS OF TELFORD AND DISTRICT (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL WILLIAM BOOTH | Chair |
|
||||||
ARTHUR RAYMOND HOOF | Trustee | 13 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Francis Martin Curry | Trustee | 11 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JIM TRANTER | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Daniel Scollard-Kerr | Trustee | 07 July 2016 |
|
|||||
PETER GEORGE SEAWARD | Trustee | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE FLORENCE JOHNSON | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BROAD | Trustee | 22 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN MACKRELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.85k | £45.34k | £47.48k | £43.15k | £41.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.13k | £44.93k | £45.76k | £43.36k | £43.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 18 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAY 2007,
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME AND ALL OTHER MONIES WHICH MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE RECEIVED BY THE TRUSTEES (WHETHER SUCH MONIES SHALL ARISE FROM DONATIONS, BEQUESTS, DEEDS OF COVENANT OR FROM ANY OTHER SOURCE) AND ALSO THE INVESTMENTS FOR THE TIME BEING REPRESENTING THE SAME (ALL OF WHICH ARE HEREINAFTER INCLUDED IN THE EXPRESSION 'THE TRUST FUND') UPON TRUST TO APPLY BOTH THE CAPITAL AND THE INCOME THEREOF FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE ROTARY CLUBS OF TELFORD AND DISTRICT (THE CLUBS) SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Wrekin Road
Wellington
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF1 1RL
- Phone:
- 07584092405
- Email:
- tranter.jim@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window