Financial history WIRRAL CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LIMITED

Charity number: 1109156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.60m £2.16m £2.16m £2.47m £2.82m
Total expenditure £1.58m £2.08m £2.08m £2.46m £2.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £1.37m £1.51m £1.75m
Income from government grants £1.52m £1.94m £600.74k £694.05k £672.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £8.53k £5.30k £12.95k £7.22k £3.71k
Income - Other trading activities £4.17k £195 £164 £1.07k £12.22k
Income - Charitable activities £1.58m £2.14m £2.14m £2.46m £2.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £413 £268 £190 £1.14k £2.33k
Income - Other £4.16k £5.79k £6.95k £5.06k £1.19k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £7.25k £5.50k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.57m £2.08m £2.07m £2.42m £2.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £9.28k £37.26k £10.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £16.86k £0 £9.16k £47.91k £31.84k