THE FRIENDS OF BRADING ROMAN VILLA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Brading Roman Villa is the volunteer support group working in partnership with the Oglander Roman Trust, Reg No 1044506, which owns the Villa site. Our volunteers provide guides whose knowledge contributes to the visitor experience at the Villa. They also help deliver the Villa programme of educational and social events for families and children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 04 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID REEVES | Chair | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Jean Pitts | Trustee | 25 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Pitts | Trustee | 03 March 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN BRYANT | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|||||
PATRICIA BARBER | Trustee | 15 May 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.69k | £2.13k | £4.54k | £2.62k | £2.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.20k | £819 | £3.26k | £4.42k | £1.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 24 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 28 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 01/07/2005 AS AMENDED ON 29/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 30 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT, SPECIFICALLY OF AND FOR THE HERITAGE SITE KNOWN AS BRADING ROMAN VILLA AND THE SURROUNDING LANDSCAPE SITUATED ON THE ISLE OF WIGHT.
Area of benefit
ISLE OF WIGHT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brading Roman Villa
Morton Old Road
Brading
SANDOWN
PO36 0PH
- Phone:
- 07775606812
- Email:
- dreeves@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window