Financial history BAMPTON BUSH CENTRE

Charity number: 1109535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £8.53k £6.02k £16.03k £13.04k £22.90k
Total expenditure £9.56k £6.92k £18.77k £22.04k £22.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £4.72k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £4.72k N/A N/A