Financial history CATERHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1109508
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £23.63m £25.37m £27.53m £29.55m £40.89m
Total expenditure £21.87m £22.41m £25.24m £25.47m £32.05m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £575.00k £214.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £224.00k £998.00k £646.00k £259.00k £408.00k
Income - Other trading activities £678.00k £591.00k £1.06m £789.00k £1.14m
Income - Charitable activities £21.99m £23.66m £25.65m £28.07m £31.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £162.00k £121.00k £174.00k £428.00k £741.00k
Income - Other £575.00k £0 £0 £0 £7.04m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £21.66m £22.22m £24.56m £24.94m £31.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £215.00k £183.00k £674.00k £528.00k £773.00k
Expenditure - Governance £29.00k £30.00k £35.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £22.00k £25.00k £27.00k £26.00k £26.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0