Trustees PRIMARY CARE DIABETES SOCIETY
Charity number: 1110415

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Ashwood | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Callum Metcalfe-O'Shea | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samina Ali | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
David John Miller | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Waqas Tahir | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rahul Mohan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Beba | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Anne Lewis | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sarah Davies | Trustee | 31 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Samuel Seidu | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lisa Devine | Trustee | 24 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Heather Bell | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Newman | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Hamilton | Trustee | 24 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Hambling | Trustee | 05 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Su Down | Trustee | 22 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Milne | Trustee | 22 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr NARESH KANUMILLI | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANE DIGGLE | Trustee | 10 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.