NATIONAL DANCE TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
NDTA is a membership organisation working to ensue that all young people in the UK have access to high quality dance education in schools. We bring together the views of our members in a single unified voice. We support dance teachers at all key stages of the national curruiculum through courses and national conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 June 2005: Standard registration
- 23 October 2024: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 October 2024: Funds transferred to 801552 ONE DANCE UK
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN DANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window