Financial history BRAINTREE DISTRICT MUSEUM TRUST

Charity number: 1110447
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £403.59k £469.29k £482.12k £455.48k £431.60k
Total expenditure £466.43k £437.37k £483.20k £505.50k £488.66k
Income from government contracts £185.19k £185.19k £185.19k £171.69k £171.69k
Income from government grants £4.55k £84.86k £96.90k £3.42k £9.13k