Accounts and annual returns THE NEW FRIENDS OF FERNCUMBE SCHOOL 1997

Charity number: 1110752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 09 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 07 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 19 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 24 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 10 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required