Financial history THE NEW FRIENDS OF FERNCUMBE SCHOOL 1997

Charity number: 1110752
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.04k £5.95k £5.63k £6.02k £13.83k
Total expenditure £7.42k £2.95k £8.22k £6.04k £9.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A