NEPALI CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty, hardship and distress and the advancement of education among children and young people, in particular but not exclusively, disabled and young children in Nepal, by the establishment and operation of a home for such persons, the establishment of a sponsorship scheme and by such other means as the Trustees may from time to time determine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bristol City
- Nepal
Governance
- 13 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Wyld | Trustee | 25 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN HARVEY | Trustee | 16 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS SARAH JANE DAVIES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £36.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £38.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/07/2005 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 05/09/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DISABLED CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE, IN NEPAL BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A HOME FOR SUCH PERSONS, THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A SPONSORSHIP SCHEME AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NEPAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 FLORENCE PARK
BRISTOL
BS6 7LT
- Phone:
- 01179421201
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window