Financial history THE RAINBOW PROJECT PLYMOUTH

Charity number: 1111397
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2020 01/04/2021 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £14.61k £16.14k £22.56k £28.59k £25.54k
Total expenditure £11.42k £16.24k £25.72k £21.82k £25.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A