Financial history THE SYBIL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1111764
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.54k £22.67k £77.08k £44.18k £65.90k
Total expenditure £17.32k £30.63k £79.18k £41.54k £68.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A