PURE LEAPFROG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are dedicated to ensuring community energy becomes a significant part of sustainable energy in the UK through accessible expertise & affordable finance to community energy groups. Our member network provides free expert professional advice to help carbon reduction projects overcome barriers to success. Our Community Energy Fund offers low interest loans for community renewable energy projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £80,361 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 November 2005: Standard registration
- 15 May 2013: Funds received from 1132778 CARBON LEAPFROG
- PURE THE CLEAN PLANET TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAEME LUDLOW | Chair | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Pughe | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CORDERY | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL JAMPEL | Trustee | 26 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHELAGH KIRKLAND | Trustee | 30 December 2014 |
|
|||||
Mark Henderson | Trustee | 18 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.82m | £2.30m | £529.64k | £486.54k | £261.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.75m | £2.27m | £528.79k | £527.23k | £281.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.90k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £41.32k | £66.71k | £220.54k | £80.36k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £426.33k | £658.57k | £291.02k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.34m | £1.55m | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £35.35k | £84.03k | £226.70k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £20.68k | £8.75k | £1.41k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £10.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £479.44k | £567.30k | £528.79k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.27m | £1.70m | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £37.04k | £29.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £315.75k | £107.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 JAN 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, PRINCIPALLY IN THE AREAS OF AIR AND WATER ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pure Leapfrog
7-14 Great Dover Street
LONDON
SE1 4YR
- Phone:
- 07399195085
- Email:
- info@pureleapfrog.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window