THE UK FRIENDS OF AUCKLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity advances and promotes education and, in particular, any educational and charitable purposes connected with Auckland Grammar School, including sports and cultural purposes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of London
- Dorset
- New Zealand
Governance
- 14 October 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Graham Harold Coop | Chair | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marie Louise Parkin | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Khoo | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruiheng Xiao | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Fenton | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lady Rosemary Buchanan | Trustee | 10 May 2018 |
|
|||||
Michael Collinson | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Anthony McNaughton | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY O'CONNOR | Trustee | 23 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD COLEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.96k | £23.89k | £2.95k | £514.81k | £126.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £19.80k | £12.19k | £79 | £642.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £514.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £79 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 04 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT AND PROMOTION OF EDUCATION AND IN PARTICULAR ANY EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH AUCKLAND GRAMMAR SCHOOL ('THE SCHOOL') INCLUDING SPORTS AND CULTURAL PURPOSES BY ANY MEANS WHICH SHALL BE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Mudeford
Christchurch
BH23 3NL
- Phone:
- 012024777741
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window